Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3305331

EP3305331 - METHOD FOR TESTING AT LEAST ONE DISINFECTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brandes Innovation Inh. Ronald Brandes
Pommersche Straße 1
26419 Schortens / DE
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Willms, Joachim
Hans-Fleischer-Str. 29
26133 Oldenburg / DE
02 / Brandes, Ronald
Pommersche Str. 1
26419 Schortens / DE
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Jabbusch, Matthias
Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85
26131 Oldenburg / DE
[2018/15]
Application number, filing date17190341.211.09.2017
[2018/15]
Priority number, dateDE20161011719613.09.2016         Original published format: DE102016117196
[2018/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3305331
Date:11.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/28
[2018/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN ZUMINDEST EINES DESINFEKTIONSMITTELS[2018/15]
English:METHOD FOR TESTING AT LEAST ONE DISINFECTANT[2018/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE VÉRIFICATION D'AU MOINS UN DÉSINFECTANT[2018/15]
Examination procedure12.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/15]
22.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/15]
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1707943  (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0 27] - [0029] - [0 49] * [I] 2,4,5;
 [X]EP1818389  (AIR LIQUIDE SANTE INT [FR], et al) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0033] *;
 [X]US4847197  (BANSEMIR KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * Sp. 1:27-31&45-51; Sp. 2:52-55 *