blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3457047 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3457047



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 120
05.06.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.03.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.02.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.10.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 22
17.10.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 22
17.10.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
17.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.05.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.05.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 6
03.05.2018 European search report Search / examination 2
03.05.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
15.09.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.09.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
15.09.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
15.09.2017 Description Search / examination 22
15.09.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.09.2017 Drawings Search / examination 11
15.09.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4