Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3457035

EP3457035 - PERSONALISED AIR PURIFICATION DEVICE WITH A BLOW-OFF PART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
14.06.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.07.2019  [2019/29]
14.06.2019Change - designated statespublished on 17.07.2019  [2019/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IQAir AG
Blumenfeldstraße 10
9403 Goldach / CH
[2019/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Hammes, Frank
Seestrasse 44
9403 Horn / CH
02 / Gottschalk, Gregory
Seestrasse 73
8700 Küsnacht / CH
03 / Susana, Christian
Riedackerweg 1
6833 Fraxern / AT
 [2019/12]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2019/12]
Application number, filing date17191243.915.09.2017
[2019/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3457035
Date:20.03.2019
Language:DE
[2019/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:F24F1/04, F24F3/16, F24F7/007, F24F13/08
[2019/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/29]
Former [2019/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PERSONALISIERTE LUFTREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM AUSBLASTEIL[2019/12]
English:PERSONALISED AIR PURIFICATION DEVICE WITH A BLOW-OFF PART[2019/12]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION DE L'AIR PERSONNALISÉ POURVU D'UNE PARTIE DE SORTIE[2019/12]
Examination procedure31.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/29]
05.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009143004  (TAM CHEUK HUNG [CN], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0028] - [0035]; figure 3 * [I] 7-14;
 [I]WO2015020260  (LEE JEONG-IL [KR]) [I] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2017053979  (SPRIMO INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0004] , [0048] , [0049] , [0064]; figures 1,4,5,6 *;
 [A]DE2735643  (ADAM JAKOB) [A] 1 * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 2; figures 4,5,6 *;
 [A]CN103528132  (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
by applicantUS9375547
 US9144697
 US8414671