Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3456302

EP3456302 - ABSORBENT CORES AND ABSORBENT ARTICLES HAVING ANISOTROPIC FOAM STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ontex BVBA
Genthof 5
9255 Buggenhout / BE
For all designated states
Ontex Group NV
Korte Keppestraat 21
9320 Erembodegem / BE
[2019/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Houben, Annemie
Meibloemstraat 61
9000 Gent / BE
02 / Rodríguez Pérez, Miguel Angel
Calle Pio Baroja nº7, 2ºB
47008 Valladolid / ES
03 / López Gil, Alberto
Plaza León Felipe nº5, 3ºA
47012 Valladolid / ES
04 / Tirado Mediavilla, Josias
Calle Tierra de Campos, s/n, Venta de Baños
34200 Palencia / ES
05 / García González, Javier
Calle Doctor Mercado nº 6, 3 Izquierda
47011 Valladolid / ES
06 / Dhooge, Lieven
Witherenlei 22
9940 Ertvelde / BE
07 / Roets, Karen
Korte Moeie 53
9900 Eeklo / BE
 [2019/12]
Representative(s)Larangé, Françoise
Ontex BVBA
Korte Keppestraat 21
9320 Aalst / BE
[2019/12]
Application number, filing date17191491.415.09.2017
[2019/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3456302
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/534, A61F13/53
[2019/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/44]
Former [2019/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SAUGFÄHIGE KERNE UND SAUGFÄHIGE ARTIKEL MIT ANISOTROPEN SCHAUMSTRUKTUREN[2019/12]
English:ABSORBENT CORES AND ABSORBENT ARTICLES HAVING ANISOTROPIC FOAM STRUCTURES[2019/12]
French:NOYAUX ABSORBANTS ET ARTICLES ABSORBANTS AYANT DES STRUCTURES EN MOUSSE ANISOTROPE[2019/12]
Examination procedure19.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/44]
20.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2005192365  (STRANDBURG GARY M [US] ET AL) [X] 1,5-9,13,14,16 * page 1, paragraphs 1,5 * * page 7, paragraphs 57,59,60 * * page 7, paragraph 64 - page 9, paragraph 74 * [A] 2-4,10-12,15;
 [A]WO2008008875  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]; BARGER MARK A [US]; BLAND DAVID [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 1, lines 4-8 * * page 2, line 5 - page 5, line 4 * * page 9, line 16 *;
 [A]US2014336606  (BEWICK-SONNTAG CHRISTOPHER PHILIP [US] ET AL) [A] 1-17 * page 6, paragraph 74 - page 7, paragraph 77 *;
 [A]EP2959922  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 2, paragraphs 1,3,5 * * page 3, paragraph 25 *;
 [A]WO9732612  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 1, lines 10-22 * * page 2, lines 3-33 * * page 3, lines 16-21 * * page 8, lines 29-31 *;
 [A]DE19607529  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * page 2, lines 3-8 * * page 2, lines 47-52 * * page 3, lines 1-11 *
by applicantUS5817704
 US5856366
 US5869171
 US6207724
 US2002128338
    - ASHIDA, K.; IWASAKI, K., Handbook of Plastic Foams, (19950000), pages 56,64 - 67
    - ODIAN, G. G., Principles of Polymerization, Wiley-Interscience, (19910000), pages 149 - 150
    - PINTO J; SOLORZANO E; RODRIGUEZ-PEREZ MA; SAJA JA, Journal of Cellular Plastics, (20130000), vol. 49, no. 6, pages 555 - 575