Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3456872

EP3456872 - WASHING AND/OR DRYING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2019/12]
Inventor(s)01 / TURGUT, Hüseyin Ílker
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / DIRLIKLI, Faruk
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2019/12]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/12]
Application number, filing date17191873.319.09.2017
[2019/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3456872
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:D06F37/06, D06F37/14
[2019/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/44]
Former [2019/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASCH- UND/ODER TROCKNUNGSMASCHINE[2019/12]
English:WASHING AND/OR DRYING MACHINE[2019/12]
French:MACHINE À LAVER ET/OU SÉCHER LE LINGE[2019/12]
Examination procedure20.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/44]
20.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2006334261  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0035] , [0036]; figure 5 *;
 [Y]WO2014147390  (XEROS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-4,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0080] , [0114]; figure 4 *;
 [A]JPS503371U  (UNKNOWN) [A] 1,9,12,13 * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]JPH0433689  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2007117278  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2007159892  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1,12,13 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015]; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]KR20100054335  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,12,13 * paragraphs [0024] , [0026]; figures 1-3 *