Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3281652

EP3281652 - SYSTEMS FOR TREATING A TISSUE SITE WITH REDUCED PRESSURE INVOLVING A REDUCED-PRESSURE INTERFACE HAVING A MULTI-LUMEN CONDUIT FOR CONTACTING A MANIFOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.10.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2018/07]
Inventor(s)01 / TOUT, Aidan Marcus
9 Collingwood Close
Alderbury, Wiltshire SP5 3FE / GB
02 / LOCKE, Christopher Brian
6 Bosworth Mews
Bournemouth, Dorset BH9 3SD / GB
 [2018/07]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/07]CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Application number, filing date17192291.720.07.2012
[2018/07]
Priority number, dateUS201161511827P26.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161511827 P
US201161511840P26.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161511840 P
[2018/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3281652
Date:14.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00, A61F13/00
[2018/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/37]
Former [2018/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEME ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER GEWEBESTELLE MIT UNTERDRUCK MIT EINER UNTERDRUCKSCHNITTSTELLE MIT EINER MEHRLUMIGEN LEITUNG ZUM KONTAKTIEREN EINES VERTEILERS[2018/07]
English:SYSTEMS FOR TREATING A TISSUE SITE WITH REDUCED PRESSURE INVOLVING A REDUCED-PRESSURE INTERFACE HAVING A MULTI-LUMEN CONDUIT FOR CONTACTING A MANIFOLD[2018/07]
French:SYSTÈMES DE TRAITEMENT D'UN SITE DE TISSUS AVEC UNE PRESSION RÉDUITE COMPRENANT UNE INTERFACE DE PRESSION RÉDUITE DOTÉE D'UNE CONDUITE MULTI-LUMIÈRES DESTINÉE À ÊTRE MISE EN CONTACT AVEC UN COLLECTEUR[2018/07]
Examination procedure21.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/37]
24.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12740850.8  / EP2736548
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2009070905  (MEDELA HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 8, line 11 - line 16 * * page 9, line 7 - line 27; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2010094957  (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 8, line 2 - line 4 * * page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1,2,4,5b *;
 [A]WO03073970  (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 5 * * page 13, line 14 - line 21; figure 7 *;
 [A]WO2011087871  (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0148] , [0149]; figures 13a,b * * paragraph [0177]; figure 22a * * paragraph [0188]; figure 30a * * paragraph [0204]; figures 43a,b * * paragraph [0211]; figures 49a,b *;
 [A]US2009270820  (JOHNSON ROYCE W [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0091] , [0094] - [0096] - [0100] , [0105] , [0106]; figures 11f,12a-e,13ab *