Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3280180

EP3280180 - METHOD AND TRANSMITTER FOR PROCESSING RADIO PROTOCOL IN MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.04.2019  [2019/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2018/06]
Inventor(s)01 / YI, Seung-June
533, Hogye-Dong, Dongan-Gu
Anyang
Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
02 / LEE, Young-Dae
533, Hogye-Dong, Dongan-Gu
Anyang
Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
03 / CHUN, Sung-Duck
533, Hogye-Dong, Dongan-Gu
Anyang
Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
04 / PARK, Sung-Jun
533, Hogye-Dong, Dongan-Gu
Anyang
Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
 [2018/06]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/06]
Application number, filing date17193106.618.03.2008
[2018/06]
Priority number, dateUS20070895720P19.03.2007         Original published format: US 895720 P
US20070896474P22.03.2007         Original published format: US 896474 P
KR2008002111206.03.2008         Original published format: KR 20080021112
[2018/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3280180
Date:07.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/02, H04W28/06, H04B7/26, // H04W80/02, H04W12/02
[2018/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/34]
Former [2018/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SENDER ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES FUNKPROTOKOLLS IN EINEM MOBILTELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2018/06]
English:METHOD AND TRANSMITTER FOR PROCESSING RADIO PROTOCOL IN MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM[2018/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET ÉMETTEUR POUR TRAITER UN PROTOCOLE RADIO DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION MOBILE[2018/06]
Examination procedure26.09.2017Examination requested  [2018/06]
26.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/14]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08723560.2  / EP2122862
Divisional application(s)EP19158592.6
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[IY]WO2006116620  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [I] 1,6-10 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraphs [0046] , [0049] , [0059] * [Y] 2-5;
 [YA]  - ASUSTEK, "Using RTP SN for PDCP SN in LTE", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-070763 LTE PDCP SN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070209), vol. RAN WG2, no. St. Louis, USA; 20070209, XP050133789 [Y] 2-5 * the whole document * [A] 1,6-10