Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3305495

EP3305495 - METHOD FOR GENERATING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURE IN A MATRIX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Karlsruher Institut für Technologie
Kaiserstrasse 12
76131 Karlsruhe / DE
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Rapp, Bastian
Hohenzollernstrasse 18
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
02 / Helmer, Dorothea
Schwindstrasse 4
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
03 / Voigt, Achim
Werderstrasse 22
76344 Eggenstein / DE
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/15]Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date17193638.828.09.2017
[2018/15]
Priority number, dateDE20161021919204.10.2016         Original published format: DE102016219192
[2018/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3305495
Date:11.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:B29C39/00, B29C31/04, B29C39/02, B29C64/106, B29C64/20
[2018/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/46]
Former [2018/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER DREIDIMENSIONALEN STRUKTUR IN EINER MATRIX[2018/15]
English:METHOD FOR GENERATING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURE IN A MATRIX[2018/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UNE STRUCTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE DANS UNE MATRICE[2018/15]
Examination procedure09.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/46]
09.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2016279868  (BURDICK JASON ALAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0 21] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraphs [0080] , [0 95] , [0 96] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0105] * * figures 6, 7, 11, 15c/d; claims 16-20 * [Y] 2,7-10;
 [XYI]DE19606210  (NACHTRODT MARTIN DR [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,9,11-15 * abstract * * column 2 - column 4 * [Y] 2 [I] 4,5,7,8
 [XYI]  - WILLIE WU ET AL, "Omnidirectional Printing of 3D Microvascular Networks", ADVANCED MATERIALS, DE, (20110624), vol. 23, no. 24, doi:10.1002/adma.201004625, ISSN 0935-9648, pages H178 - H183, XP055453902 [X] 1-6,8-15 * page H178 - page H179; figures 1a-1e * * page H181, column r - page H182 * * page H180 - page H181; figures 2a-d * [Y] 2,7-10 [I] 4,5,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201004625
    [ ] - WILLIE WU ET AL, "Omnidirectional Printing of 3D Microvascular Networks - Supporting Information", ADVANCED MATERIALS, DE, (20110624), vol. 23, no. 24, doi:10.1002/adma.201004625, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 1 - 3, XP055454009 [ ] * page 1 - page 2; figure S1a *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201004625