Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3308658

EP3308658 - AN AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE WITH ADJUSTABLE AIRFLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.10.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[2019/44]
Former [2018/16]For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Dubief, Flavien
Chemin de la Vidéride 4a
1424 Champagne / CH
 [2018/20]
Former [2018/16]01 / Dubief, Flavien
Rue du Rocher 52
CH-2000 Neuchatel / CH
Representative(s)Sánchez García, Juan
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2019/44]
Former [2018/16]Palmer, Benjamin Jeffrey
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
Application number, filing date17194414.305.12.2012
[2018/16]
Priority number, dateEP2011019269508.12.2011         Original published format: EP 11192695
[2018/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3308658
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3308658
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A24D3/04, A24F47/00
[2018/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/47]
Former [2018/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINSTELLBAREM LUFTSTROM[2018/16]
English:AN AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE WITH ADJUSTABLE AIRFLOW[2018/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'AÉROSOL DOTÉ D'UN DÉBIT D'AIR RÉGLABLE[2018/16]
Examination procedure15.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/47]
15.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2019Observations by third parties
16.09.2019Fee for grant paid
16.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12812889.9  / EP2787844
Divisional application(s)EP19189679.4
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010200006  (ROBINSON JOHN HOWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0081] , [0082]; figure 1 *;
 [AD]WO2009132793  (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [AD] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2186537  (INHALENESS B V [NL]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0027] - [0032] - [0053] - [0069]; figures 1-3,6-9 *;
 [A]US4898190  (DEAL PHILIP A [US]) [A] 1,7,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US2124130  (DEVENTER ALBERT G VAN) [A] 1,7,11 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2009132793