Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3311667

EP3311667 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Charleston Laboratories, Inc.
1001 N. US Highway 1
Suite 500
Jupiter, FL 33477 / US
[2018/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BOSSE, Paul
18822 Rio Vista Drive
Jupiter, FL Florida 33469 / US
02 / AMELING, John
3331 Squirrelsnest Lane
Cincinnati, OH 45252-1051 / US
03 / SCHACHTEL, Bernard
109 Quayside Drive
Jupiter, FL Florida 33477 / US
04 / TAKIGIKU, Ray
3952 Timberwoods Ct
Loveland, OH Ohio 45140 / US
 [2018/17]
Representative(s)Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[2018/17]
Application number, filing date17194444.008.07.2010
[2018/17]
Priority number, dateUS20090223999P08.07.2009         Original published format: US 223999 P
US20090224424P09.07.2009         Original published format: US 224424 P
[2018/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3311667
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/42, A61K31/44
[2018/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Former [2018/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2018/17]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS[2018/17]
French:COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES[2018/17]
Examination procedure19.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/49]
19.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.12.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
26.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10797879.3  / EP2451274
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
26.02.2019Request for further processing filed
26.02.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.03.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO2009089494  (CHARLESTON LAB INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0163] * * paragraph [0211] - paragraph [0212] * * paragraph [0404] - paragraph [0417]; example 13 * * claims 85-93; table 1 *;
 [I]WO2008070268  (CHARLESTON LAB INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0156] * * example 1; claims 1, 2, 9, 10, 15, 16, 19, 20, 22 *