Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9526704 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2016 | B2 | US2016317447 | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615206955 | 11.07.2016 | WO2010US41433 | 08.07.2010 | US96742310 | 14.12.2010 | US22399909 | 08.07.2009 | US201414244455 | 03.04.2014 | US22442409 | 09.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9433625 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2016 | B2 | US2014308349 | 16.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41433 | 08.07.2010 | US96742310 | 14.12.2010 | US22399909 | 08.07.2009 | US201414244455 | 03.04.2014 | US22442409 | 09.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8728522 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2014 | B2 | US2011262539 | 27.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41433 | 08.07.2010 | US96742310 | 14.12.2010 | US22399909 | 08.07.2009 | US22442409 | 09.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10532030 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2020 | B2 | US2018333360 | 22.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615206955 | 11.07.2016 | WO2010US41433 | 08.07.2010 | US96742310 | 14.12.2010 | US22399909 | 08.07.2009 | US201414244455 | 03.04.2014 | US22442409 | 09.07.2009 | US201815993431 | 30.05.2018 | US201615346541 | 08.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10016368 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2018 | B2 | US2017049704 | 23.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615206955 | 11.07.2016 | WO2010US41433 | 08.07.2010 | US96742310 | 14.12.2010 | US22399909 | 08.07.2009 | US201414244455 | 03.04.2014 | US22442409 | 09.07.2009 | US201615346541 | 08.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2451274 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2017 | B1 | EP2451274 | 02.04.2014 | A4 | EP2451274 | 16.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41433 | 08.07.2010 | US22399909 | 08.07.2009 | US22442409 | 09.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2767576 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2020 | C | CA2767576 | 13.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41433 | 08.07.2010 | US22399909 | 08.07.2009 | US22442409 | 09.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3311667 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10797879 | 08.07.2010 | US22399909 | 08.07.2009 | US22442409 | 09.07.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011006012 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22399909 | 08.07.2009 | US22442409 | 09.07.2009 | Type | Earlier application | EP2451274 |