Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3306333

EP3306333 - DIFFERENTIAL FAULT DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / VON SEBO, Joseph
16116 W. El Dorado Drive
New Berlin, WI 53151 / US
02 / STIPAN, Peter M.
25315 Windsong Court
Wind Lake, WI 53185 / US
03 / HOLMBURG, David R.
186 Debbie Drive
Waukesha, WI 53189 / US
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2018/15]Fiorentino, Luca
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date17194698.104.10.2017
[2018/15]
Priority number, dateUS20161528511204.10.2016         Original published format: US201615285112
[2018/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3306333
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/40, G01R31/42, G01R31/02
[2018/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/36]
Former [2018/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIFFERENZFEHLERERKENNUNGSSYSTEM[2018/15]
English:DIFFERENTIAL FAULT DETECTION SYSTEM[2018/15]
French:SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE DÉFAUT DIFFÉRENTIEL[2018/15]
Examination procedure04.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2015346255  (WAGNER CARL A [US]) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0011] , [0013] - [0025] - [0028] - [0030]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2010079093  (KITANAKA HIDETOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0012] - [0013] - [0015] - [0017] - [0052] - [0063] - [0074] - [0077] - [0088] , [0092] , [0094] , [0146] - [0158]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2014117910  (LE DONG [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0020] - [0030] - [0035] - [0036]; figures 1,6 *;
 [A]JP2013038917  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0013] - [0016] - [0020] - [0023] *;
 [A]US2013322133  (LI HUAQIANG [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025]; figure 1 *