Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467307

EP3467307 - PRESSURE CONTROL OF HYDRAULIC SYSTEM WITH ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
20.09.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - designated statespublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Automation, Press and Tooling, A.P. & T AB
Industrigatan 5
514 32 Tranemo / SE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Sundqvist, Per
Granvägen 1
514 31 Tranemo / SE
02 / Carlsson, Thomas
Mellangatan 1
341 39 Ljungby / SE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
Östra Storgatan 7
553 21 Jönköping / SE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17194730.204.10.2017
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467307
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:F04B17/03, F04B49/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/43]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRUCKSTEUERUNG EINES HYDRAULIKSYSTEMS MIT ELEKTROMOTOR[2019/15]
English:PRESSURE CONTROL OF HYDRAULIC SYSTEM WITH ELECTRIC MOTOR[2019/15]
French:RÉGLAGE DE LA PRESSION D'UN SYSTÈME HYDRAULIQUE COMPRENANT UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/15]
Examination procedure11.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/43]
11.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2014219822  (MUELLER KARSTEN [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-4; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US2016084274  (AFSHARI THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0046] *;
 [X]US5281774  (MASAKI TAKANOBU [JP]) [X] 1,7 * figure 1; claim 1 *
by applicantEP1882534