Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3287776

EP3287776 - MICRO HEATER AND MICRO SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Point Engineering Co., Ltd.
89 Asan Valley-ro
Dunpo-myeon
Asan-si, Chungcheongnam-do 31409 / KR
[2018/09]
Inventor(s)01 / AHN, Bum Mo
5104-1502, 35, Edu town-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Gyeonggi-do
16509 Suwon-si / KR
02 / PARK, Seung Ho
403-1001, 39, Haengjeongjungang 1-ro
Hyangnam-eup, Gyeonggi-do
18599 Hwaseong-si / KR
03 / BYUN, Sung Hyun
106-803, 264, Dongtanbanseok-ro
Gyeonggi-do
18452 Hwaseong-si / KR
 [2018/09]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/09]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date17194842.515.06.2016
[2018/09]
Priority number, dateKR2015008672218.06.2015         Original published format: KR 20150086722
KR2015008676618.06.2015         Original published format: KR 20150086766
KR2015009268830.06.2015         Original published format: KR 20150092688
[2018/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3287776
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/12, G01N33/00
[2018/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
Former [2018/09]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIKROHEIZER UND MIKROSENSOR[2018/09]
English:MICRO HEATER AND MICRO SENSOR[2018/09]
French:MICRORÉCHAUFFEUR ET MICROCAPTEUR[2018/09]
Examination procedure04.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/39]
23.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16174642.5  / EP3115775
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational searchKR20090064693  [ ]
 KR101019576B  [ ]
 [X]US2015021716  (LEE DAE-SIK [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-6 * figures 1, 2,3 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36] , [0 40] , [0 43] , [0 44] *
 [X]US2002118027  (ROUTKEVITCH DMITRI [US] ET AL) [X] 1,6 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0 55] *
 [X]US2007062812  (WEBER HERIBERT [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,3,6 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0028] , [0 48] *
 [X]US2004213702  (INGRISCH KURT [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] * * figure 1 *
 [AD]US2010134948  (PARK HYUN-CHUL [KR] ET AL) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0043] , [0 79] - [0081] * * figures 3A, 6, 9 *