EP3467899 - BATTERY PACK FOR MULTIPLE BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states aentron GmbH Dornierstr. 21 82205 Gilching / DE | [2020/20] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states aentron GmbH Friedrichshafener Str. 7 82205 Gilching / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Roche, John Eichendorffplatz 8b 81369 München / DE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Keilitz, Wolfgang Keilitz Haines & Partner Patentanwälte PartGmbB Nigerstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2020/21] |
Former [2019/15] | Keilitz, Wolfgang Patentanwälte Keilitz & Partner, Partnerschaft Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17194893.8 | 05.10.2017 | [2019/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467899 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3467899 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
H01M50/267 (EP);
H01M50/204 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AKKUPACK FÜR MEHRERE AKKUS | [2019/15] | English: | BATTERY PACK FOR MULTIPLE BATTERIES | [2019/15] | French: | BLOC-BATTERIE POUR UNE PLURALITÉ DES BATTERIES | [2019/15] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 25.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2017 | AL | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | IE | 05.10.2020 | LU | 05.10.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 05.10.2017 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.10.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.10.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE10055620 (MAKITA CORP [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * figures 2,5,11; claims 1-24 * [A] 1-4; | [X]US2009104516 (YOSHIHARA YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-26; claims 1-31 *; | [YA]US2014212737 (BAE SANGHOON [KR], et al) [Y] 5-7 * figures 1-9; claims 1-13 *[A] 1-4 |