Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3305473

EP3305473 - ELECTRIC HAND-HELD MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metabowerke GmbH
Metabo-Allee 1
72622 Nürtingen / DE
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Schumayer, Florian
Wehrstrasse 18
73235 Weilheim/Teck / DE
02 / Scheib, Sebastian
Südring 18
76848 Spirkelbach / DE
03 / Kielblock, Frauke
Oberlausitzenweg 1
73061 Ebersbach / DE
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/15]
Application number, filing date17194906.805.10.2017
[2018/15]
Priority number, dateDE20161011880505.10.2016         Original published format: DE102016118805
[2018/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3305473
Date:11.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:B25F5/02
[2018/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/45]
Former [2018/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROHANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE[2018/15]
English:ELECTRIC HAND-HELD MACHINE TOOL[2018/15]
French:MACHINE-OUTIL À MAIN ÉLECTRIQUE[2018/15]
Examination procedure26.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/45]
26.09.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010062326  (KONUMA YUUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * figures 1, 2, 3, 4 * * paragraphs [0026] , [0090] , [0093] * [I] 2-5,10,11;
 [XI]US2009108806  (TAKANO NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * figures 1, 2, 4 * * paragraph [0010] * [I] 2-5,10,11;
 [A]EP2003761  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *