Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3305677

EP3305677 - REUSABLE CONTAINER FOR STORING AND FOR TRANSPORTING FOODSTUFFS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Durmus, Alpay
In den Senften 1
32051 Herford / DE
For all designated states
Single, Hendrik
Werrestr. 66
32049 Herford / DE
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/15]
Application number, filing date17195235.106.10.2017
[2018/15]
Priority number, dateDE201620105636U07.10.2016         Original published format: DE 202016105636 U
[2018/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3305677
Date:11.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:B65D21/04, B65D83/00
[2018/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRWEG-BEHÄLTER ZUM LAGERN UND TRANSPORTIEREN VON LEBENSMITTELN[2018/15]
English:REUSABLE CONTAINER FOR STORING AND FOR TRANSPORTING FOODSTUFFS[2018/15]
French:RÉCIPIENT RÉUTILISABLE DESTINÉ À STOCKER ET À TRANSPORTER DES DENRÉES ALIMENTAIRES[2018/15]
Examination procedure12.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/16]
21.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/16]
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0004027  (AGGIO GIORDANO) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, line 11 - line 29 * * figures 1, 5, 6 * [Y] 6,9-11;
 [X]GB716006  (HERMORION LTD) [X] 1,2,4,8 * page 1, line 61 - page 2, line 1; figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO9524110  (GICS & VERMEE LP [US]) [Y] 6 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US3861576  (TOLAAS WILLIAM M ET AL) [Y] 9-11 * column 3, line 41 - line 47 * * column 4, line 11 - line 19 * * figures 5, 6 *