Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468115

EP3468115 - METHOD TO IMPROVE AVAILABILTY OF REAL-TIME COMPUTER NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TTTech Computertechnik AG
Schönbrunner Strasse 7
1040 Wien / AT
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Steiner, Wilfried
Kolschitzkygasse 23/13
1040 Wien / AT
02 / Bauer, Günther
Argentinierstraße 36/14
1040 Wien / AT
03 / Jakovljevic, Mirko
Siebeneichengasse 16/39
1150 Wien / AT
04 / Geven, Arjan
Taborstraße 48/17
1020 Wien / AT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Biberstraße 22
Postfach 36
1010 Wien / AT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17195409.209.10.2017
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468115
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/725, H04L7/00, // H04L29/06, H04L12/931
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER ERREICHBARKEIT VON ECHTZEIT-COMPUTERNETZWERKEN[2019/15]
English:METHOD TO IMPROVE AVAILABILTY OF REAL-TIME COMPUTER NETWORKS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER LA DISPONIBILITÉ DES RÉSEAUX INFORMATIQUES EN TEMPS RÉEL[2019/15]
Examination procedure09.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
09.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]  - W Steiner ET AL, "Chapter 8 - Time-Triggered Ethernet", Time-Triggered Communication, CRC Press, (20111019), pages 181 - 220, ISBN 978-1-4398-4661-2, XP055456901 [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * Section 8.1 Protocol Overview Section 8.2 Protocol Services - Section 8.2.1.4 Media Access Control; page 182 - page 192 * * Section 8.2.2 Clock Synchronisation; page 196 - page 198 * * Section 8.2.3 Startup and Restart Section 8.2.3.4 Clique detection Section 8.2.4 Diagnostic Services; page 201 - page 207 * * Section 8.3 Protocol Parameterization; page 210 - page 213 * [A] 5,12
by applicant   - "ARINC 664, P7: Avionics Full Duplex Switched Ethernet (AFDX) Network", ARINC Specification, (20050600), vol. 664
    - AS6802: Time-Triggered Ethernet, URL: http://standards.sae.org/as6802
    - IEEE 802.1 - Time Sensitive Networking Task Group, (20141103), URL: http://www.ieee802.org/1/pages/tsn.html
    - IEEE 802.1Qbv - Enhancements for Scheduled Traffic, (20151007), URL: http://www.ieee802.org/l/pages/802.1bv.html