Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467334

EP3467334 - A FREQUENCY TUNED DAMPER AND A METHOD FOR USE IN MANUFACTURING SUCH A DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.12.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vibracoustic Forsheda AB
Storgatan 28
331 71 Forsheda / SE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Gustavsson, Bengt-Göran
Söregårdsvägen 26
333 72 BREDARYD / SE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17195459.709.10.2017
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467334
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:F16F1/373, F16F7/108
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FREQUENZABGESTIMMTER DÄMPFER UND VERFAHREN ZUM GEBRAUCH BEI DER HERSTELLUNG SOLCH EINES DÄMPFERS[2019/15]
English:A FREQUENCY TUNED DAMPER AND A METHOD FOR USE IN MANUFACTURING SUCH A DAMPER[2019/15]
French:AMORTISSEUR ACCORDÉ EN FRÉQUENCE ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS LA FABRICATION D'UN TEL AMORTISSEUR[2019/15]
Examination procedure09.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
09.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO0192752  (FORSHEDA AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-16 * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE102005009677  (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5699865  (FOERDERER KARL [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 2 *
by applicantWO0192752
 WO2013167524
 WO2008127157