Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466869

EP3466869 - METHOD FOR THE COMBINED PREPARATION OF METHANOL AND AMMONIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
20.09.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - designated statespublished on 23.10.2019 [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GasConTec AG
Engelgasse 83
4052 Basel / CH
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHULZ, Alexander
Hammarskjäldring 75g
60439 Frankfurt / DE
02 / VÖLKL, Johannes
Promenade 9
65779 Kelkheim / DE
03 / KUNZ, Sina
An der oberen Lache 6
65993 Frankfurt / DE
04 / MÜLLER, Dierk
Zingelweg 3
61184 Karben / DE
05 / KOSS, Ulrich
Heuchelheimer Strasse 19
61348 Bad Homburg von der Höhe / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser
Partnerschaft mbB
Goltsteinstraße 87
50968 Köln / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17195544.609.10.2017
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466869
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/02, C01B3/12, C01B3/50, C07C29/151
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/43]
Former [2019/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KOMBINIERTEN HERSTELLUNG VON METHANOL UND VON AMMONIAK[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR THE COMBINED PREPARATION OF METHANOL AND AMMONIA[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION COMBINÉE DE MÉTHANOL ET D'AMMONIAC[2019/15]
Examination procedure16.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/43]
16.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2005095313  (LURGI [DE]; DAVEY WILLIAM [DE]; WURZEL THOMAS [DE]) [X] 15 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 7 * * figure 2 * [A] 1-14;
 [A]DE102007008690  (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3712008  (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102004013539