Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3466869


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.09.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
20.09.2019 Request for examination filed published on  23.10.2019  [2019/43]
20.09.2019 Change - designated states published on  23.10.2019  [2019/43]
16.09.2019 Amendment by applicant
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
09.10.2017 Change - representative