Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471425

EP3471425 - AUDIO PLAYBACK SYSTEM, TV SET, AND AUDIO PLAYBACK METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DERELI, Ulas
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / ÖZBAY, Mustafa Caner
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17195631.110.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471425
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/439
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUDIOABSPIELSYSTEM, FERNSEHER UND AUDIOABSPIELVERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:AUDIO PLAYBACK SYSTEM, TV SET, AND AUDIO PLAYBACK METHOD[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME DE LECTURE AUDIO, APPAREIL DE TÉLÉVISION ET PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE AUDIO[2019/16]
Examination procedure16.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/47]
16.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2006077532  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 14, line 1 - page 17, line 18; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]WO2007135581  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 10, line 17 - page 13, line 27; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2012324515  (DASHEVSKIY LEONID [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0084]; figures 1-14 *;
 [A]EP2000967  (ADVERTOOLS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0030] - [0034] - [0048]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2008132663  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 27 - page 9, line 13; figures 1-5 *