Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469989

EP3469989 - APPARATUS FOR RADIOPHARMACEUTICAL QUANTIFICATION OF A BODY PART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2019/16]
Representative(s)BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17195657.610.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469989
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/03, A61B6/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR RADIOPHARMAZEUTISCHEN QUANTIFIZIERUNG EINES KÖRPERTEILS[2019/16]
English:APPARATUS FOR RADIOPHARMACEUTICAL QUANTIFICATION OF A BODY PART[2019/16]
French:APPAREIL DE CONTOURNAGE ADAPTATIF D'UNE PARTIE DU CORPS[2019/16]
Examination procedure03.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2019/41]
13.05.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/41]
Documents cited:Search   [XAYI] - BRIAN F HUTTON ET AL, "Review and current status of SPECT scatter correction", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, Bristol GB, (20110623), vol. 56, no. 14, doi:10.1088/0031-9155/56/14/R01, ISSN 0031-9155, pages R85 - R112, XP055295330 [X] 1,2,10,14-17 * abstract * * section "1. Introduction" * * section "4.3 Spectral models" * [A] 3-5 [Y] 7-9 [I] 6,11-13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/56/14/R01
 [Y]  - MACEY D J ET AL, "IMPROVED CONJUGATE VIEW QUANTITATION OF I-131 BY SUBTRACTION OF SCATTER AND SEPTAL PENETRATION EVENTS WITH A TRIPLE ENERGY WINDOW METHOD", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19951001), vol. 22, no. 10, doi:10.1118/1.597423, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 1637 - 1643, XP000543042 [Y] 7-9 * abstract * * section "III. Materials and Methods" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.597423
 [A]  - ROBERTSON A K H ET AL, "Multi-isotope SPECT imaging of theAc decay chain: feasibility studies", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL GB, vol. 62, no. 11, doi:10.1088/1361-6560/AA6A99, ISSN 0031-9155, (20170505), pages 4406 - 4420, (20170505), XP020317479 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * section "2. Materials and Methods" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1361-6560/aa6a99
by applicant   - MICHAEL LJUNGBERG; SVEN-ERIK STRAND, "A Monte Carlo program for the simulation of scintillation camera characteristics", Computer Methods and Programs in Biomedicine, (19890000), vol. 29, no. 4, ISSN 0169-2607, pages 257 - 272