Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470186

EP3470186 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STRIPPING PRE-INSULATED PIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Georg Fischer Rohrleitungssysteme AG
Ebnatstrasse 111
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Breyer, Markus
Westendstrasse 7
78315 Radolfzell / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Fenner, Seraina
Georg Fischer AG
Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17195949.711.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470186
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:B26D3/00, B23D21/04, B26D1/36
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/45]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABISOLIEREN VON VORISOLIERTEN ROHRLEITUNGEN[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STRIPPING PRE-INSULATED PIPES[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉNUDAGE DES CONDUITS PRÉISOLÉS[2019/16]
Examination procedure01.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/45]
01.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[AD]US2017252831  (HUNNEKUHL JOERG [DE] ET AL) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE29516513U  (GOLLETZ PAUL T [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE4409438  (LADWIG PETER DIPL ING [DE]; LADWIG ALEXANDER [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]JPS57163525  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0281764  (PFITZMANN WOLFGANG) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [T]  - Georf Fischer Rohrleitungssysteme AG, "Bedienungsanleitung COOL-FIT 2.0/2.0M + 4.0 - Abisolier- und Schälwerkzeug d32 - d90 / d110 - d225", CH-8201 Schaffhausen/Switzerland, (20180101), URL: http://www.gfps.com/appgate/ecat/common_flow/10002N/INT/en/109067/494492/507389/P501157/product.html, (20180409), XP055465582
 [T]  - Georg Fischer Piping Systems Ltd, "COOL-FIT 2.0 foam removal and peeling tool - GF Piping Systems - English", You Tube, (20170818), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=26zyf2GHM6w, (20180409), XP054978236
by applicantDE29516513U
 EP3213890