Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3310031

EP3310031 - IMAGE READING DEVICE, DOCUMENT FEEDER DEVICE, AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2018/16]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Yuichi
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / KAWAMURA, Shinji
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2018/16]
Representative(s)Williamson, Brian
Canon Europe Limited
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/16]Williamson, Brian
Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
Application number, filing date17195950.511.10.2017
[2018/16]
Priority number, dateJP2016020040511.10.2016         Original published format: JP 2016200405
[2018/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3310031
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/00, H04N1/12
[2018/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Former [2018/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDLESEVORRICHTUNG, DOKUMENTZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/16]
English:IMAGE READING DEVICE, DOCUMENT FEEDER DEVICE, AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS[2018/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION DE DOCUMENTS ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGE[2018/16]
Examination procedure27.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/49]
18.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2010250038  (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]US9089064  (KATSUYAMA GORO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [AD]JP2013030042  (ZENRIN CO LTD) [AD] 1-17 * abstract *
by applicantUS9089064
 JP2013030042