blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3293124

EP3293124 - HIGH POWER PACKAGING METHOD FOR PACKAGING OF, IN PARTICULAR SMALL PIECES, PRODUCTS AND HIGH POWER PACKAGING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.05.2024
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2024Revocation of patentpublished on 03.07.2024  [2024/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THEEGARTEN-PACTEC GMBH & CO. KG
Breitscheidstrasse 46
01237 Dresden / DE
[2018/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Förster, Bodo
Steinweg 16
01768 Glashütte / DE
02 / Wehner, Gert
Mittelweg 2
01328 Dresden / DE
03 / Oehlert, Volker
Mühlweg 6a
01809 Doha/Röhrsdorf / DE
 [2018/11]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2018/11]
Application number, filing date17196003.202.10.2013
[2018/11]
Priority number, dateDE2012101990911.10.2012         Original published format: DE102012019909
[2018/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3293124
Date:14.03.2018
Language:DE
[2018/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3293124
Date:04.12.2019
Language:DE
[2019/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2017
ClassificationIPC:B65B25/00, B65B65/00, A23G7/00, B65B37/16, // B65B11/32
[2018/11]
CPC:
A23G7/0012 (EP,CN); A23G7/0018 (EP,CN); A23G7/0062 (EP,CN);
B65B11/32 (EP,CN); B65B25/005 (EP,CN); B65B37/16 (EP,CN);
B65B65/006 (EP,CN) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/42]
Former [2018/11]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HOCHLEISTUNGS-VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR VERPACKUNG VON, INSBESONDERE KLEINSTÜCKIGEN, PRODUKTEN UND HOCHLEISTUNGS-VERPACKUNGSEINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS[2018/11]
English:HIGH POWER PACKAGING METHOD FOR PACKAGING OF, IN PARTICULAR SMALL PIECES, PRODUCTS AND HIGH POWER PACKAGING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD[2018/11]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'EMBALLAGE À HAUTE PERFORMANCE PERMETTANT L'EMBALLAGE, EN PARTICULIER EN MORCEAUX, DE PRODUITS ET DISPOSITIF D'EMBALLAGE À HAUTE PERFORMANCE, EN PARTICULIER PERMETTANT LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCÉDÉ[2018/11]
Examination procedure11.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/42]
25.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
29.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2019Fee for grant paid
05.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13776958.4  / EP2906473
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.09.2020  08.09.2020  ADMISSIBLE
Sapal SA
Av. du Tir-Fédéral 44
1024 Ecublens / CH
Opponent's representative
Bovard SA Neuchâtel
Rue des Beaux-Arts 8
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
 [2024/15]
Former [2020/42]
Opponent(s)01  04.09.2020  08.09.2020  ADMISSIBLE
Sapal SA
Av. du Tir-Fédéral 44
1024 Ecublens / CH
Opponent's representative
Bovard SA Neuchâtel
Rue des Noyers 11
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
18.09.2020Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.01.2021Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.03.2022Date of oral proceedings
28.04.2022Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.04.2022Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
11.04.2024Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/27]
27.05.2024Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition06.07.2022Appeal received No.  T1690/22
06.07.2022Payment of appeal fee
08.09.2022Statement of grounds filed
11.04.2024Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
27.05.2024Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
11.04.2024Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.10.2013
AL04.12.2019
CY04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
DK04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
MC04.12.2019
MK04.12.2019
MT04.12.2019
PL04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SI04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
TR04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
IS04.04.2020
PT29.04.2020
AT02.10.2020
IE02.10.2020
LU02.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/27]HU02.10.2013
AL04.12.2019
CY04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
DK04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
MC04.12.2019
MT04.12.2019
PL04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SI04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
TR04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
IS04.04.2020
PT29.04.2020
AT02.10.2020
IE02.10.2020
LU02.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
Former [2022/07]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
DK04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
MC04.12.2019
PL04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SI04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
IS04.04.2020
PT29.04.2020
AT02.10.2020
IE02.10.2020
LU02.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
Former [2021/46]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
DK04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
MC04.12.2019
PL04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SI04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
IS04.04.2020
PT29.04.2020
IE02.10.2020
LU02.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
Former [2021/36]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
DK04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
MC04.12.2019
PL04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SI04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
IS04.04.2020
PT29.04.2020
LU02.10.2020
BE31.10.2020
Former [2021/31]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
DK04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
MC04.12.2019
PL04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SI04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
IS04.04.2020
PT29.04.2020
LU02.10.2020
Former [2020/51]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
DK04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
PL04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SI04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
IS04.04.2020
PT29.04.2020
Former [2020/47]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
DK04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
IS04.04.2020
PT29.04.2020
Former [2020/40]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
IS04.04.2020
PT29.04.2020
Former [2020/37]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
SK04.12.2019
SM04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
PT29.04.2020
Former [2020/36]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
EE04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
PT29.04.2020
Former [2020/35]AL04.12.2019
CZ04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
RO04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
Former [2020/32]AL04.12.2019
FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
Former [2020/26]FI04.12.2019
HR04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
RS04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
Former [2020/23]FI04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
LV04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
GR05.03.2020
Former [2020/22]FI04.12.2019
LT04.12.2019
SE04.12.2019
BG04.03.2020
NO04.03.2020
Former [2020/21]NO04.03.2020
Documents cited:Search[YA]US6233903  (IDE SHOICHI [JP]) [Y] 1,9 * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 11 * * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 29; figures 1,3 *[A] 2-8,10-15;
 [YA]EP1981762  (CT PACK SRL [IT]) [Y] 1,9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-8,10-15;
 [YDA]DE102008019605  (THEEGARTEN PACTEC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 1,9 * figure 18 * [A] 2-8,10-15
by applicantDE102005017329
 DE102008019605
OppositionUS3987605
 US4819407
 US4947617
 EP0399966
 EP0608824
 DE102006020517
 WO2008041082
 EP1981762
 DE102008019605
 US2010307106
 EP2626305
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.