Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3470716 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3470716



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 39
04.12.2019 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
29.11.2019 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
17.04.2019 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.03.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 4
22.03.2018 European search report Search / examination 2
22.03.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
13.03.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
13.10.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.10.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
13.10.2017 Description Search / examination 7
13.10.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.10.2017 Drawings Search / examination 2
13.10.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5