Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3470716


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
29.11.2019 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
13.10.2017 Change - representative