Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470048

EP3470048 - PHOTOCURABLE DENTAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
25.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dentsply DeTrey GmbH
De-Trey-Strasse 1
78467 Konstanz / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Szillat, Florian
Tulengasse 1
78462 Konstanz / DE
02 / Maier, Maximilian
Burgplatz 12
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / Renn, Caroline
August-Ruf-Strasse 37
78224 Singen / DE
04 / Klee, Joachim E.
Espelweg 3/4
78315 Radolfzell / DE
05 / Elsner, Oliver
Blücherstrasse 3b
78315 Radolfzell / DE
06 / Kempter, Jörg
Brückengasse 5/7
78462 Konstanz / DE
07 / Lalevée, Jacques
86, rue des Castors
68200 Mulhouse / FR
08 / Bouzrati-Zerelli, Mariem
5, rue du Bourg
Résidence Parc de la Tour
68100 Mulhouse / FR
09 / Kirschner, Julie
16A, rue Maymatt
67650 Dambach-la-Ville / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Dietz, Mirko
Sirona Dental Systems GmbH
Fabrikstraße 31
64625 Bensheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Schiener, Jens
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstraße 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date17196330.913.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470048
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K6/083, A61K6/00, A61K6/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LICHTHÄRTBARE DENTALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2019/16]
English:PHOTOCURABLE DENTAL COMPOSITION[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITION DENTAIRE PHOTODURCISSABLE[2019/16]
Examination procedure17.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
17.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0408357  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11,13,15 * page 2, lines 8-10 * * page 2, line 35 - page 6 * * page 7, lines 3-5,24,46-49 * * page 12; example 9 * * claims 1-5,9,10 * [Y] 2,10,14;
 [X]US2005070624  (KALGUTKAR RAJDEEP S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,11-15 * page 1, paragraph [0007] - page 2, paragraph [0018] * * page 6, paragraph [0088] - paragraphs [0091],[0096],[0097] * * page 7, paragraphs [0100],[0102] * * page 8, paragraphs [0110],[0112],[0117] * * page 9, paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0141] * * page 13; example 6 * * claims 1,4,12,22,23,24,29, *;
 [X]EP0237233  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11,13,15 * page 2, line 34 - line 43 * * page 3, line 9 - line 38 * * page 4, line 1 - line 9 * * page 5, line 35 - line 43 * * page 6, line 10 - line 18 * * page 7, lines 1-8,51 - page 8, line 7 *;
 [X]US2009137697  (ORI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11-13,15 * examples 9,23 *;
 [D]EP1938781  (SUN MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]);
 [Y]US2005070621  (KALGUTKAR RAJDEEP S [US]) [Y] 2,14 * page 1, paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * page 4, paragraph [0082] * * page 6, paragraph [0104] * * page 7, paragraph [0114] - page 13, paragraph [0169] *;
 [Y]EP0329268  (KERR MFG CO [US]) [Y] 10 * page 4, line 31 - line 35 * * claims 5,8 *
by applicantUS3534122
 US5545676
 WO9962460
 WO2017017155
 EP1938781
 EP1502569
 US2006247330
 US2003018098
 WO2017060459
 EP2604247
    - NICEWICZ D.A. et al., Org. Synth., (20080000), vol. 85, pages 278 - 286
    - NICEWICZ D.A., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20050000), vol. 127, no. 17, pages 6170 - 6171
    - BOYCE G.R. et al., J. Org. Chem., (20120000), vol. 77, no. 10, pages 4503 - 4515
    - BOYCE G.R. et al., Org. Lett., (20120000), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 652 - 655
    - EL-ROZ, M. et al., Current Trends in Polymer Science, (20110000), vol. 15, pages 1 - 13