Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470599

EP3470599 - OSB BOARD AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SWISS KRONO Tec AG
Museggstrasse 14
6004 Luzern / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SAUTER, Harald
Zellerhornstr. 83
72461 Albstadt / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17196384.613.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470599
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3470599
Date:11.09.2019
Language:DE
[2019/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:E04F13/10, E04F13/08
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:OSB-PLATTE UND VERWENDUNG DERSELBIGEN[2019/16]
English:OSB BOARD AND USE OF SAME[2019/16]
French:PANNEAU OSB ET SON UTILISATION[2019/16]
Examination procedure04.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
04.07.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2019Fee for grant paid
30.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19190530.6
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO2017013221  (AKZENTA PANEELE + PROFILE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-13 * page 1, line 4 - page 6, line 8; figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]US2010236171  (LIU DAVID C [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-3,6,7-14 *;
 [Y]WO2004053257  (PERGO EUROP AB [SE]) [Y] 1-13 * page 5, line 5 - page 9, line 31; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]WO2016113721  (FLOORING IND LTD SARL [LU]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2328051  (BULL ALVAH S) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, column r, line 13 - page 2, column l, line 39; figures 1-7 *
by applicantWO2017013221
 DE202014105181U