Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470639

EP3470639 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A REDUCING AGENT GAS FROM A LIQUID OR SOLID REDUCING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.06.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Winterthur Gas & Diesel Ltd.
Schützenstrasse 1-3
8401 Winterthur / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Kadau, Dirk
Heinrich-Wolff-Strasse 17
8046 Zürich / CH
02 / Brutsche, Martin
Räterschenstrasse 31
8418 Schlatt / CH
03 / Peitz, Daniel
Bruggerstrasse 135
5400 Baden / CH
04 / Elsener, Martin
Burghaldenweg 52
5313 Klingnau / CH
05 / Carelli, Andreas
Bassersdorferstrasse 67
8305 Dietlikon / CH
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17196592.416.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470639
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/20
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/31]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES REDUKTIONSMITTELGASES AUS EINEM FLÜSSIGEN ODER FESTEN REDUKTIONSMITTEL[2019/16]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A REDUCING AGENT GAS FROM A LIQUID OR SOLID REDUCING AGENT[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN GAZ D'AGENT RÉDUCTEUR À PARTIR D'UN AGENT RÉDUCTEUR LIQUIDE OU SOLIDE[2019/16]
Examination procedure25.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/31]
25.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[XYI]JPH06165913  (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1-3,8,11,12,14 * abstract * * figure 8 * [Y] 7,13 [I] 4-6,9,10;
 [XI]JP2004313917  (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1,3,5,8,9,11,12,14 * abstract * * figure 1 * [I] 4;
 [Y]CN103395801B  (DATANG ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGIES ENGINEERING CO LTD; CHINA DATANG TEC) [Y] 7 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO02092512  (CHEMITHON CORP [US]) [Y] 13 * figure 10 *;
 [X]CN205650094U  (REN YIHU, et al) [X] 1,8,9,11,13,14 * figure 1 *
by applicantUS6077491