Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471115

EP3471115 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING A VOLTAGE PULSE DURING THE ROTATION OF A ROTATING SHAFT MOUNTED AROUND A ROTATION AXIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
02.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baumer MDS GmbH
Bodenseeallee 7
78333 Stockach / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Sperling, Tilo
Zoznegger Strasse 34
78333 Stockach / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Strauss, Steffen
Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 Group Intellectual Property
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17196643.516.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471115
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01F7/16
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/36]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES SPANNUNGSPULSES BEI ROTATION EINER UM EINE ROTATIONSACHSE ROTIERBAR GELAGERTEN WELLE[2019/16]
English:DEVICE FOR GENERATING A VOLTAGE PULSE DURING THE ROTATION OF A ROTATING SHAFT MOUNTED AROUND A ROTATION AXIS[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'IMPULSION DE TENSION LORS D'UNE ROTATION D'UN ARBRE MONTÉ DE MANIÈRE ROTATIVE AUTOUR DE L'AXE DE ROTATION[2019/16]
Examination procedure26.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/36]
26.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[A]US4829248  (LOUBIER ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 7 - 14 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 7 * * figures 1, 5 *;
 [A]DE2539548  (FORD WERKE AG) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph erster * * page 2, paragraphs erster, zweiter * * page 5, paragraph erster vollständiger * * page 8, paragraph zweiter * * figures 1, 2, 4 - 6 *;
 [A]EP0658745  (MEHNERT WALTER DR [DE]; THEIL THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-15;
 [A]DE4224129  (DUERRWAECHTER E DR DODUCO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 3 - 15 *