Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469941

EP3469941 - VISOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pinlock Patent B.V.
Zilverparkkade 135
8232 WL Lelystad / NL
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LIPKENS, Paul Wilhelmus
Venhovenstraat 17
3670 Meeuwen-Gruitrode / BE
02 / DE BOER, Herman
Van Limburg Stirumstraat 8
1272 EP Huizen / NL
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17196686.416.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469941
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A42B3/22
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VISIERANORDNUNG[2019/16]
English:VISOR ASSEMBLY[2019/16]
French:ENSEMBLE VISIÈRE[2019/16]
Examination procedure10.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
Request for further processing for:The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor
10.07.2019Request for further processing filed
10.07.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.07.2019Decision despatched
Documents cited:Search[AD]US2017150768  (LIPKENS PAUL WILHELMUS [BE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032]; figures 4a,4b *;
 [A]US2015153492  (ARNOLD DEREK LESLIE [NL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029]; figures 3a,3b *;
 [AD]US2010175160  (ARNOLD DEREK LESLIE [NL]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0112] , [0113] , [0117]; figures 3,7 *
by applicantUS5765235
 US6922850
 US2010175160
 US2017150768