Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470350

EP3470350 - PORTION CAPSULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.02.2020
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tchibo GmbH
Überseering 18
22297 Hamburg / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Bröckel, Jens
Barmbeker Str. 15
22303 Hamburg / DE
02 / Balkau, Werner
Lassigen 277
8762 Schwändi / CH
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Frei Patent Attorneys
Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG
Postfach
8032 Zürich / CH
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17196687.216.10.2017
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470350
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:B65D85/804
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PORTIONENKAPSEL[2019/16]
English:PORTION CAPSULE[2019/16]
French:CAPSULE MONO-DOSE[2019/16]
Examination procedure18.10.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/12]
31.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2020/12]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1792850  (TCHIBO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,12 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-9 * [I] 4,5,9,10;
 [XI]EP1344722  (SCHIFFERLE RENE [CH]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-7 * [I] 4,5,9,10,12;
 [XI]WO2016016819  (CAFFITALY SYSTEM SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,6-8,11 * page 3, line 26 - page 9, line 1; figures 1-14 * [I] 3-5,9,10,12;
 [XI]DE102004056224  (TCHIBO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,12 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0051]; figures 2-4 * [I] 4,5,9,10
by applicantEP1659909