Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3312993

EP3312993 - SWITCHING ASSEMBLY FOR ACTUATING AN IGNITABLE SEMICONDUCTOR CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 05.12.2018  [2018/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metabowerke GmbH
Metabo-Allee 1
72622 Nürtingen / DE
[2018/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Wiesner, Bernd
Wölfflinstr. 5
73277 Owen / DE
 [2018/17]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/17]
Application number, filing date17196873.817.10.2017
[2018/17]
Priority number, dateDE20161012001520.10.2016         Original published format: DE102016120015
[2018/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3312993
Date:25.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/725, H02M5/257, H02P1/16
[2018/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Former [2018/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINER ZÜNDBAREN HALBLEITERSCHALTUNG[2018/17]
English:SWITCHING ASSEMBLY FOR ACTUATING AN IGNITABLE SEMICONDUCTOR CIRCUIT[2018/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION PERMETTANT LA COMMANDE D'UN CIRCUIT À SEMICONDUCTEUR POUVANT ÊTRE AMORCÉ[2018/17]
Examination procedure19.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/49]
19.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2016134669  (GUANGZHOU KINGSER ELECTRONICS CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-8 * figure 4 *;
 EP3255794  [ ] (GUANGZHOU KINGSER ELECTRONICS CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * figure 4 *;
 [A]WO2010066270  (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JP2001028534  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS58197919  (YABUKI MANABU) [A] 4,8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4119835  (COULMANCE JEAN-PIERRE RENE, et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *