Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473458

EP3473458 - HORIZONTAL TENSIONER FOR TENSIONINGSYSTEM OF TARPAULIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Franz Miederhoff oHG
Röhre 50
59846 Sundern / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Papenheim, Josef
Am Waldbach 16
59846 Sundern / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB
Körnerstrasse 27
58095 Hagen / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17196907.417.10.2017
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473458
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3473458
Date:02.10.2019
Language:DE
[2019/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60J5/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:HORIZONTALSPANNER FÜR SEITENSPANNPLANENSYSTEME[2019/17]
English:HORIZONTAL TENSIONER FOR TENSIONINGSYSTEM OF TARPAULIN[2019/17]
French:TENSEUR POUR SYSTÈME TENSION D'UNE BÂCHE LATÉTRALE[2019/17]
Examination procedure14.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
14.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2019Fee for grant paid
21.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Documents cited:Search[A]DE202016101450U  (MECADETOL SA [ES]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP2551152  (THIRIET [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 3,11,12 *;
 [A]GB2258805  (SEAKA PROD LTD [NZ]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]EP1642683  (PWP SA [CH]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP2860062  (PWP SA [CH]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3 *
by applicantDE29808736U