Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474006

EP3474006 - MICROCHIP FOR FREE FLOW ELECTROPHORESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université de Liège
Place du 20 août 7
4000 Liège / BE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DELMARCELLE, Michaël
Rue de la Station, 218 bte 1
1457 Walhain / BE
02 / STEFANIC, Patrick
Rue Saint-Gilles, 349 bte 042
4000 Liège / BE
03 / JORIS, Bernard
Rue de la Gendarmerie, 51
4141 Louveigné / BE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Savoye, Anne
ICOSA Europe
Rue d'Oultremont 37
1040 Bruxelles / BE
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Savoye, Anne
ICOSA Europe
Rue d'Oultremont 37
1200 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date17197296.119.10.2017
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474006
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/447
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIKROCHIP FÜR FREIFLUSSELEKTROPHORESE[2019/17]
English:MICROCHIP FOR FREE FLOW ELECTROPHORESIS[2019/17]
French:MICROPUCE POUR ÉLECTROPHORÈSE À FLUX LIBRE[2019/17]
Examination procedure24.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
24.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2008025806  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]; WEBER GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0050] - [0053] - [0068] , [0073] - [0075] - [0104]; figure 8b *;
 [Y]EP0497077  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 9 - line 16 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 43 *;
 [Y]US2012228141  (JUNG BYOUNGSOK [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0028] *;
 [Y]US3829370  (BOURAT G) [Y] 4-6,9 * column 5, line 65 - line 73 *
by applicant   - SONG et al., Analytical Chemistry, (20100000), vol. 92, pages 2317 - 2325