Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473674

EP3473674 - POLYPROPYLENE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABU DHABI POLYMERS CO. LTD (BOROUGE) LLC.
Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex
P.O. Box 6925
Corniche Road
Abu Dhabi / AE
For all designated states
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN HOUCKE, Daniel Marie
P.O. Box 6951
Borouge Pte Ltd
Corniche Road
Abu Dhabi / AE
02 / QUDAIH, Rana N. S.
P.O. Box 6951
Borouge Pte Ltd
Corniche Road
Abu Dhabi / AE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17197338.119.10.2017
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473674
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/12
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYPROPYLENZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2019/17]
English:POLYPROPYLENE COMPOSITION[2019/17]
French:COMPOSITION DE POLYPROPYLÈNE[2019/17]
Examination procedure22.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
22.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US8957159  (JIANG PEIJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * example 31 *;
 [A]US4186240  (IWATA KAZUO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * example 10 *;
 [A]US3412078  (HAGEMEYER JR HUGH J ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9620225  (MONTELL TECHNOLOGY COMPANY BV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6177377  (CHIEN JAMES C W [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0887379
 EP0887380
 EP0887381
 EP0991684
 WO9212182
 WO2004000899
 WO2004111095
 WO9924478
 WO9924479
 WO0068315
 WO8707620
 WO9221705
 WO9311165
 WO9311166
 WO9319100
 WO9736939
 WO9812234
 WO9933842
 WO03000756
 WO03000757
 WO03000754
 WO03000755
 WO2004029112
 EP2610271
 WO2012007430
 WO9219659
 WO9219653
 WO9219658
 US4382019
 US4435550
 US4465782
 US4473660
 US4560671
 US5539067
 US5618771
 EP0045975
 EP0045976
 EP0045977
 WO9532994
 US4107414
 US4186107
 US4226963
 US4347160
 US4472524
 US4522930
 US4530912
 US4532313
 US4657882
 US4581342
 WO2007137853
    - Y. MINAMI et al., Polymer Journal, (20150000), vol. 45, pages 227 - 234
    - Plastic Additives Handbook, Hans Zweifel, (20090000), pages 1141 - 1190
    - ZHOU, Z.; KUEMMERLE, R.; QIU, X.; REDWINE, D.; CONG, R.; TAHA, A.; BAUGH, D.; WINNIFORD, B., J. Mag. Reson, (20070000), vol. 187, page 225
    - BUSICO, V.; CARBONNIERE, P.; CIPULLO, R.; PELLECCHIA, R.; SEVERN, J.; TALARICO, G., Macromol. Rapid Commun., (20070000), vol. 28, page 1128
    - CHENG, H. N., Macromolecules, (19500000), vol. 17, no. 1984
    - RESCONI, L.; CAVALLO, L.; FAIT, A.; PIEMONTESI, F., Chem. Rev., (20000000), vol. 100, page 1253
    - WANG, W-J.; ZHU, S., Macromolecules, (20000000), vol. 33, page 1157
    - CHENG, H. N., Macromolecules, (19840000), vol. 17, page 1950
    - BUSICO, V.; CIPULLO, R., Prog. Polym. Sci., (20010000), vol. 26, page 443
    - BUSICO, V.; CIPULLO, R.; MONACO, G.; VACATELLO, M.; SEGRE, A.L., Macromoleucles, (19970000), vol. 30, page 6251
    - KAKUGO, M.; NAITO, Y.; MIZUNUMA, K.; MIYATAKE, T., Macromolecules, (19820000), vol. 15, page 1150