Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474251

EP3474251 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACTIVE TRAFFIC MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2020
Database last updated on 29.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.04.2020 [2020/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SARIARSLAN, Muhammet Kürsat
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17197388.619.10.2017
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474251
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/01, G08G1/017, G08G1/04, G08G1/052, G08G1/095
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AKTIVEN VERKEHRSÜBERWACHUNG[2019/17]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACTIVE TRAFFIC MONITORING[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE TRAFIC ACTIVE[2019/17]
Examination procedure25.10.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/14]
15.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2020/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2017294117  (BURKE BERTRAM V [US] ET AL) [X] 1,6,8,10,11,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0030] , [0062] , [0084] , [0085] , [0092] - [0095] - [0147] , [0147] , [0150] , [0153] , [0157] , [0176] , [0177] * [Y] 3-5,7,9,12,13,15 [I] 2;
 [Y]KR101060460B  (CHO YONG SUNG [KR]) [Y] 3-5,9,12,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0008] , [0010] - [0014] - [0019] - [0024] - [0028] - [0033] - [0035] , [0046] *;
 [Y]KR101060460K  (CHO YONG SUNG [KR]) [Y] 3-5,9,12,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0008] , [0010] - [0014] - [0019] - [0024] - [0028] - [0033] - [0035] , [0046] *;
 [Y]US2010149334  (WIRSZ JON [US]) [Y] 7,13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0026] - [0032] - [0061] , [0065] *
by applicantUS5317311
 US6411328
 US2010082180
 WO2012013228
 JPH08106594
 CN104680819