blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3312959

EP3312959 - ENERGY SUPPLY UNIT FOR PROVIDING AT LEAST ONE SWITCHABLE ENERGY OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PHOENIX CONTACT GmbH & Co. KG
Flachsmarktstrasse 8
32825 Blomberg / DE
[2018/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Fomenko, Alexander
Greifswalder Straße 73
33605 Bielefeld / DE
02 / Wölk, Gerhard
Ostpreußenstraße 11
32816 Schieder-Schwalenberg / DE
 [2018/17]
Representative(s)RCD-Patent Giesen, Schmelcher & Griebel Patentwanwälte PartG mbB
Kaiserstraße 100
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/25]RCD Patent Giesen, Schmelcher & Griebel Patentwanwälte PartG mbB
Kaiserstraße 100
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
Former [2018/17]Schmelcher, Thilo
RCD-Patent
Postfach 3106
52118 Herzogenrath / DE
Application number, filing date17197445.420.10.2017
[2018/17]
Priority number, dateDE20161012009921.10.2016         Original published format: DE102016120099
[2018/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3312959
Date:25.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3312959
Date:19.06.2019
Language:DE
[2019/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2018
ClassificationIPC:H02H1/00, H02H1/04, H02H3/06, H02H3/093, H02H3/24, H02H3/247, H02H11/00
[2019/11]
CPC:
G01R31/52 (EP,US); H02H1/0007 (US); H02H1/043 (EP,US);
H02H11/008 (US); H02H3/06 (US); H02H3/0935 (US);
H02H3/243 (EP,US); H02H3/247 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/17]H02H1/04, H02H3/24, H02H3/247
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Former [2018/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSEINHEIT ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG ZUMINDEST EINES SCHALTBAREN ENERGIEAUSGANGS[2018/17]
English:ENERGY SUPPLY UNIT FOR PROVIDING AT LEAST ONE SWITCHABLE ENERGY OUTPUT[2018/17]
French:UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR AU MOINS UNE SORTIE D'ÉNERGIE COMMUTABLE[2018/17]
Examination procedure23.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/49]
23.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2019Fee for grant paid
08.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.10.2017
AL19.06.2019
CY19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
MK19.06.2019
MT19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
IE20.10.2019
LU20.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
[2022/32]
Former [2021/34]HU20.10.2017
AL19.06.2019
CY19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
MT19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
IE20.10.2019
LU20.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2021/33]HU20.10.2017
AL19.06.2019
CY19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
IE20.10.2019
LU20.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2021/26]AL19.06.2019
CY19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
IE20.10.2019
LU20.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2020/46]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
IE20.10.2019
LU20.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2020/37]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
LU20.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
BE31.10.2019
Former [2020/36]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
LU20.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/35]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
LU20.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/29]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
PT21.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
PT21.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/22]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/17]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/14]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/12]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/11]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2020/07]AL19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/47]LT19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[I]DE19705776  (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-7 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 20 * * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 22 * * column 11, line 11 - column 13, line 30 *;
 [I]EP0968871  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024] *;
 [I]EP1185149  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0074] *;
 [A]CN202930903U  (CHONGQING SOUTHWEST INTEGRATED CIRCUIT DESIGN CO LTD) [A] 1-7* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.