Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473845

EP3473845 - STARTER FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
06.09.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
06.09.2019Change - designated statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mahle International GmbH
Pragstraße 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PADOVAN, Dominik
Angela Besednjaka2.a
5000 Nova Gorica / SI
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17197562.620.10.2017
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473845
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:F02N15/00, F02N15/02, F02N15/06, F02N15/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/41]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STARTER FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2019/17]
English:STARTER FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE[2019/17]
French:DÉMARREUR POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2019/17]
Examination procedure29.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2019Examination requested  [2019/41]
29.08.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2012234280  (KIMURA MOTOAKI [JP]) [X] 1,3,8-10,14,15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0045] * * figure - * [A] 2,5-7,11-13 [I] 4;
 [XA]JPS63186964  (NIPPON DENSO CO) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-15;
 [XA]US2235076  (MCGRATH WILLIAM L) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [A] 2-15;
 [XA]DE102013224928  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [000l] * * figure - * [A] 2-15
by applicantUS8776752