Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3321853

EP3321853 - FACIAL RECOGNITION SIMILARITY THRESHOLD ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.11.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/50]
Former [2018/20]For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NECHYBA, Michael
244 Yardley Way
Pittsburgh, PA Pennsylvania 15206 / US
 [2018/20]
Representative(s)Thorniley, Peter
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/50]
Former [2018/20]Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date17197730.914.08.2013
[2018/20]
Priority number, dateUS201261683617P15.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261683617 P
US20121364508704.10.2012         Original published format: US201213645087
[2018/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3321853
Date:16.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/20]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3321853
Date:11.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06K9/62
[2018/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/52]
Former [2018/20]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ÄHNLICHKEITSSCHWELLENWERTEINSTELLUNG BEI DER GESICHTSERKENNUNG[2018/20]
English:FACIAL RECOGNITION SIMILARITY THRESHOLD ADJUSTMENT[2018/20]
French:RÉGLAGE DE SEUIL DE SIMILARITÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE FACIALE[2018/20]
Examination procedure14.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2018Examination requested  [2018/52]
14.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.11.2019Fee for grant paid
01.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13180464.3  / EP2698742
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]US2008192991  (GREMSE FELIX [DE], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0025] *;
 [I]EP2091021  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0054] *;
 [A]EP1962280  (BIOMETRY COM AG [CH]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0036] * * claim 5 *;
 [A]  - ALAN L. YUILLE, "Deformable Templates for Face Recognition", JOURNAL OF COGNITIVE NEUROSCIENCE, Cambridge, Mass., USA, (19910101), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1162/jocn.1991.3.1.59, ISSN 0898-929X, pages 59 - 70, XP055448135 [A] 1-8 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1162/jocn.1991.3.1.59