Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3473397


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.10.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
25.10.2019 Request for examination filed published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019 Change - designated states published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.10.2019 Amendment by applicant
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
24.10.2017 Change - representative