Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3478039

EP3478039 - ARRANGEMENT FOR VENTILATING HEAT OUT OF A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
08.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
08.11.2019Change - designated statespublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2019/18]
Inventor(s)01 / SARIARSLAN, Muhammet Kürsat
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2019/18]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2019/18]
Application number, filing date17198787.827.10.2017
[2019/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3478039
Date:01.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:H05K5/02, H05K7/20
[2019/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/50]
Former [2019/18]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUM ABFÜHREN VON WÄRME AUS EINER VORRICHTUNG[2019/18]
English:ARRANGEMENT FOR VENTILATING HEAT OUT OF A DEVICE[2019/18]
French:AGENCEMENT DE VENTILATION DE CHALEUR HORS D'UN DISPOSITIF[2019/18]
Examination procedure04.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2019Examination requested  [2019/50]
04.11.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005241810  (MALONE CHRISTOPHER G [US] ET AL) [I] 1,4-12 * abstract * * figures 1-4,6-8 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0027] *;
 [A]US9735083  (BODENWEBER PAUL F [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - line 27 *
by applicantCN101370109
 JP2004364072