Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3318343

EP3318343 - BENDING SPRING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PRCI SAS
Avenue du Moulin de la Jasse, BP 30
34750 Villeneuve les Maguelone / FR
[2018/19]
Inventor(s)01 / GROUSSIN, Gérôme
16B Villa de l'Industrie
93400 SAINT-OUEN / FR
 [2018/19]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2018/19]
Application number, filing date17200438.407.11.2017
[2018/19]
Priority number, dateFR2016006080908.11.2016         Original published format: FR 1660809
[2018/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3318343
Date:09.05.2018
Language:FR
[2018/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:B21D9/01, B21F35/02
[2018/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/51]
Former [2018/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIEGEFEDER[2018/19]
English:BENDING SPRING[2018/19]
French:RESSORT A CINTRER[2018/19]
Examination procedure09.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2018Examination requested  [2018/51]
09.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB195278  (DANIEL MCNAUGHT TARBET) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 45 - line 48; figure 4 * [I] 6-10;
 [XI]CN102189201B  (QIANJIANG SPRING CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * figure 1 * [I] 6-10;
 [XI]CN2287228Y  (QIANJIANG SPRING FACTORY HANGZ [CN]) [X] 1-5 * figure 1 * [I] 6-10;
 [XAI]US411756  (BRIGHAM H M [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3 [I] 6-10;
 [A]SU963648  (SHYAULYAJSKIJ VELOSIPEDO MOTOR [SU]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2,3,5 *