Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3311856

EP3311856 - REDUCED-PRESSURE TREATMENT SYSTEMS WITH RESERVOIR CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2018/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PRATT, Benjamin Andrew
c/o KCI Licensing Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX Texas 78265 / US
02 / LOCKE, Christopher Brian
c/o KCI Licensing Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX Texas 78265 / US
03 / TOUT, Aiden Marcus
c/o KCI Licensing Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX Texas 78265 / US
 [2018/17]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/29]Cordina, Kevin John
Simmons & Simmons LLP
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
Former [2018/17]CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Application number, filing date17201994.507.08.2009
[2018/17]
Priority number, dateUS20080087377P08.08.2008         Original published format: US 87377 P
[2018/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3311856
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3311856
Date:17.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00
[2018/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/49]
Former [2018/17]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNGSSYSTEME MIT REDUZIERTEM DRUCK MIT BEHÄLTERSTEUERUNG[2018/17]
English:REDUCED-PRESSURE TREATMENT SYSTEMS WITH RESERVOIR CONTROL[2018/17]
French:SYSTÈMES DE TRAITEMENT À PRESSION RÉDUITE AVEC COMMANDE DU RÉSERVOIR[2018/17]
Examination procedure19.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2018Examination requested  [2018/49]
19.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09791297.6  / EP2346545
EP15188186.9  / EP2992912
Divisional application(s)EP19182363.2
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
16.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
16.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
16.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
16.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO03101508  (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * page 7, line 15 - page 23, line 25 * * figures 9,27,32 * [I] 2,3,7-11;
 [XI]US2007032763  (VOGEL RICHARD C [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1,6-10 * [I] 2,3,7-11;
 [A]WO2008036360  (KCI LICENSING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,2 *