Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3409225

EP3409225 - VERTEBRAL STABILIZATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer GmbH
Sulzer Allee 8
8404 Winterthur / CH
[2018/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmocker, Sonia
Hafenstrasse 60
8590 Romanshorn / CH
 [2018/49]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/49]
Application number, filing date17202929.019.08.2011
[2018/49]
Priority number, dateUS2010087156930.08.2010         Original published format: US 871569
[2018/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3409225
Date:05.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2018/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/29]
Former [2018/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR STABILISIERUNG DER WIRBELSÄULE[2018/49]
English:VERTEBRAL STABILIZATION SYSTEM[2018/49]
French:SYSTÈME POUR LA STABILISATION DU RACHIS[2018/49]
Examination procedure09.03.2018Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
16.04.2018Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
05.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/29]
05.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11178195.1  / EP2422729
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
07.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1961392  (BIEDERMANN MOTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4,12 *;
 [A]US2008234744  (ZYLBER EMMANUEL [FR] ET AL) [A] 1 * figure - *