blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3409225 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3409225



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 171
05.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.06.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.06.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
05.06.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.06.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
05.06.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
05.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.12.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.11.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
15.10.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.10.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.10.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 4
01.10.2018 European search report Search / examination 2
01.10.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.09.2018 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
19.09.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
26.07.2018 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 2
15.03.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
14.03.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
14.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.02.2018 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
09.02.2018 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
29.01.2018 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 2
21.11.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.11.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
21.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
21.11.2017 Description Search / examination 24
21.11.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.11.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.11.2017 Drawings Search / examination 15
21.11.2017 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
21.11.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
20.10.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 55