blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3409225


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.08.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.06.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established
14.06.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.07.2019  [2019/29]
14.06.2019 Change - designated states published on  17.07.2019  [2019/29]
02.11.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
14.08.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.07.2018 Change: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
27.07.2018 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
15.04.2018 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
26.11.2017 Change - representative
24.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid