Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3308732

EP3308732 - CATHETER AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sirona Medical Technologies, Inc.
4 Somerset Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
[2018/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DESAI, Jawahar M.
8755 Petite Creek Way
Roseville, CA 95661 / US
 [2018/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2018/16]
Application number, filing date17203002.508.07.2009
[2018/16]
Priority number, dateUS2008017379415.07.2008         Original published format: US 173794
[2018/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3308732
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3308732
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14
[2018/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/02]
Former [2018/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KATHETER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN ABLATION[2018/16]
English:CATHETER AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED ABLATION[2018/16]
French:CATHÉTER ET PROCÉDÉ D'ABLATION AMÉLIORÉE[2018/16]
Examination procedure03.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/02]
03.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09790135.9  / EP2330997
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008161792  (WANG HUISUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] - [0085] *;
 [A]US6217574  (WEBSTER WILTON W JR [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 63 - column 7, line 36 *;
 [A]WO9618349  (LORENTZEN TORBEN [DK]) [A] 1-11 * page 13, line 16 - page 14, line 30; figures 1,2a-2e * * page 8, line 30 - line 33 *;
 [A]WO03024349  (TISSUELINK MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 30, line 16 - page 32, line 25; figures 8-11 * * page 13, line 13 - line 24 * * page 35, line 37 - page 36, line 24; figures 15,16 * * page 40, line 18 - page 41, line 30 *;
 [A]US5688267  (PANESCU DORIN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 1; figure 8 *;
 [A]EP0830091  (DESAI JAWAHAR M [US]) [A] 12-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0044]; figures 1, 2A-B *;
 [A]US2007083194  (KUNIS CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al) [A] 12-15 * paragraphs [0070] - [0100]; figures 1-10 *
by applicantUS4940064
 US6522905
 US6738673
    - WITTKAMPF et al., "RF Catheter Ablation: Lessons on Lesions", PACE, (20061129), pages 1285 - 1297
    - DEMAZUMDER et al., "Comparison of Irrigated Electrode Designs for Radiofrequency Ablation of Myocardium", Journal of Interventional Cardiac Electrophysiology, (20010000), vol. 5, pages 391 - 400
    - WITTKAMPF et al., "RF Catheter Ablation: Lessons on Lesions", PACE, (20061100), vol. 29, pages 1285 - 1297
    - NAKAGAWA et al., "Inverse Relationship Between Electrode Size and Lesion Size During Radiofrequency Ablation With Active Electrode Cooling", Circulation, (19980000), vol. 98, pages 458 - 465